S.Purushothama Chari [S.P.Chari] శేషం పురుషోత్తమాచార్య[ యస్పీచారి] DoB 14-4-1946. Qualifications:M.A.,LL.B.,PG Dip.PMIR&LW.,PG Dip.MM. Retired as DGM (FA&PR) from M/s ECIL(2006). I am Freemason and Member of Deccan Club, Hyderabad. గుర్తించబడిన రచయితగా అరవైకథల్ని, ఎయిర్ హోస్టెస్, పడగ నీడ, హృదయరాగం , చండేరీ, భారత దర్శిని, శ్రీ వైష్ణవ దివ్యదేశాలు, భారతీయ శైవక్షేత్రాలు అను పుస్తకాల్నివ్రాసాను. My Novel ‘Chanderi’ is the base for ‘Magadheera’,the most popular movie ever made in Telugu.
Monday, June 9, 2014
My house in Sainikpuri
" సరళాలయ "
Plot No.94 [House No.37-11/2], Defence Colony
Sainikpuri, Hyderabad -500 094
"సరళాలయ" గృహ ప్రవేశం తేదీ : December,18,1985
I built my house in Defence Colony, Sainikpuri in the year 1985. At that time the Sainikpuri was an isolated locality without any connectivity with the city. But today it is one of the most advanced living zone of the Hyderabad.
Arnav Birth Day September 26
Had a Child
My elder Grand Son Arnav Shesham born to my elder son Srinivas and Latha.
Marriage of my younger son Sridhar
నా చిన్న కొడుకు "శ్రీధర్" + "జీవన" (జోఅన్నా) వివాహం
February 25, 2006
My second son Sridhar married Joannah Perez at City of Manila, Philippines on 25 Feb 2006. The marriage was first conducted according o Hindu mythology in a Ram Mandir temple and then at a Churnch. Reception was arranged in a Five Star Hotel.
The first step into my house
మా ఇంటి మహాలక్ష్మి అనంత లక్ష్మి లత.
The first step into my house by my Daughter-in-Law SAL Latha. She along with my son looking at my script of an Article written by me.
Marriage of my elder son Srinivas.
నా పెద్దకొడుకు "శ్రీనివాస్" + చి.సౌ."అనంత లక్ష్మీలత" వివాహం
December 11, 1998
My elder son Srinivas married Anantha Lakshmi Latha at Thyagaraya Ganasabha, Hyderabad. The marriage was attended by sri K L Reddy, Grand Master, Grand Lodge of India, Sri Gollapudi Maruthi Rao, Film Actor, Sri T Krishna, Film Director.
Srinu -Latha's marriage engagment ceremony
శ్రీను-లతల వివాహ నిశ్చితార్థం వేడుక , విజయనగరం
Date : 12-8-1998
My Farm House
My Farm House at Jawahar Nagar, Shamirpet Taluk
March 7, 1974 at Balaji Nagar-Haridas Palli ,Ranga Reddy District.
I have been assigned with 5 (Five) Acres Agricultural Land in Survey No.134 by the Jawahar Nagar Co-operative Land Colonisation Society for Ex-Servicemen near Haridas Palli village, Medchal Taluq, Hyderabad (Regd.No.20886) vide Government of Andhra Pradesh Order No.GOMS.No.1571, Home (Labour IV) dated 18-7-1966.
My Farm House Rest Home and Field Workers living accommodation can be seen below: The land had been well developed as Paddy field with bore wells and under ground pipelines. Mango and coconut Trees are growing around the Rest House accommodation.
My Farm House Rest Home and Field Workers living accommodation can be seen below: The land had been well developed as Paddy field with bore wells and under ground pipelines. Mango and coconut Trees are growing around the Rest House accommodation.
My second son Sridhar born !
Sridhar Sesham Was Born
May 29,1972
I call my younger son 'Sridhar' as 'Naanee'...and..'Seedhee' , Others call him 'Vijjee' becos he was born immediately after the victory of India in Indo-Pak War -1971.
My elder son Srinivas born !
My elder Srinivas born
I call my elder son 'Srinivas' as 'Naanaa' and 'Seenaa'. Others call him 'Vippy' becos he was born during the period of first Telangana state demand movement initiated by former CM of AP, Dr.M.Chenna Reddy.
Joined Indian Air Force on 09-6-1964.
Date of Recruitment : 09-6-1964.
Trained in Bangalore and Belgaum.
Date of completion of Training : 09-3-1965
Passed out as Air Craftsman-I
First posting to Gwalior No.3 Air Force Selection Board : 09-3-1965
Promoted to Leading Air Craftsman (LAC) 01-10-1965
Transferred to No.1 JTTW (FTW) ,Hakimpet, Secunderbad : 21-9-1965
Promoted to the Rank of Corporal : 01-10-1968
Transferred to No.257 SU AF , Siliguri, Darjeeling (WB) 05-4-1969
Transferred to No.11 AFH, Hindon, Ghaziabad : 06-4-1972
Transferred to No.28 Wing AF, Hindon, Ghaziabad :27-5-1973
Transferred to AFHB Bangalore : 15-9-1975
Retired from Indian Air Force : 30-6-1979
Trained in Bangalore and Belgaum.
Date of completion of Training : 09-3-1965
Passed out as Air Craftsman-I
First posting to Gwalior No.3 Air Force Selection Board : 09-3-1965
Promoted to Leading Air Craftsman (LAC) 01-10-1965
Transferred to No.1 JTTW (FTW) ,Hakimpet, Secunderbad : 21-9-1965
Promoted to the Rank of Corporal : 01-10-1968
Transferred to No.257 SU AF , Siliguri, Darjeeling (WB) 05-4-1969
Transferred to No.11 AFH, Hindon, Ghaziabad : 06-4-1972
Transferred to No.28 Wing AF, Hindon, Ghaziabad :27-5-1973
Transferred to AFHB Bangalore : 15-9-1975
Retired from Indian Air Force : 30-6-1979
Subscribe to:
Posts (Atom)